**Adding Squared Numbers**

Here we are providing the tricks how to add the squared numbers this trick is very easy if you have any problem related to any tricks you will contact us.

### TRICK NO 1

**Adding Squared Numbers In The Form a ^{2} + (2a)^{2}**

This method is very easy since from algebra we know:

** a ^{2} + (2a)^{2} = 5a**

^{2 }

**Step first :** (a²)

**Step second :** (5∗a²)

Therefore, you square the smaller number, then multiply by 5 for the answer.

**Example (i)** 11^{2 }+ 22^{2} =_________.

Here **a** is **11** then

(a) 11^{2} = 121.

(b) 121 x 5 = 605.

(c) The answer is 605.

**Ex (ii)** 25^{2} + 50^{2} =_________.

Here **a** is **25** then

(a) 25² = 625.

(b) 625 x 5 = 3125.

(c) The answer is 3125.

**TRICK NO 2**

**Adding Squared Numbers In The Form: a ^{2} + (3a)**

^{2 }

This method is very easy since from algebra we know:

**a ^{2} + (3a)^{2} = 10a^{2 }**

Therefore, you square the smaller number, then multiply by 10 for the answer.

**Ex (iii)** 32^{2} + 96^{2} =_________.

(a) 32^{2} = 1024.

(b) 1024 x 10 = 10240.

(c) The answer is 10240.

**Ex (iv)** 49^{2} + 147^{2} =_________.

(a) 49^{2} = 2401.

(b) 2401 x 10 = 24010.

(c) The answer is 24010.

**TRICK 3:**

**Adding Squared Numbers In The Form: a ^{2} + (7a)**

^{2 }

This method is very easy since from algebra we know:

**a ^{2} + (7a)^{2} = 50a**

^{2 }

Therefore, you square the smaller number, then multiply by 50 for the answer.

**Ex (v)** 6^{2} + 42^{2} =_________.

(a) 6^{2} = 36.

(b) 36 x 50 = 1800.

(c) The answer is 1800.

**Ex (vi)** 15^{2} + 105^{2} =_________.

(a) 15^{2}= 225.

(b) 225 x 50 = 11250.

(c) The answer is 11250

**TRICK 4**

**Adding Squared Numbers In The Form: a ^{2} + (10a)**

^{2 }

This method is very easy since from algebra we know:

## a^{2} + (10a)^{2} = 101a^{2}

Therefore, you square the smaller number, then multiply by 101 for the answer.

**Ex (vii)** 14^{2} + 140^{2} =_________.

(a) 14^{2} = 196.

(b) 196 x 101 = 19796.

(c) The answer is 19796.

**Ex (viii)** 31^{2} + 310^{2} =_________.

(a) 31^{2} = 961.

(b) 961 x 101 = 97061.

(c) The answer is 97061.